EP1408488 - Adaptive focusing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelbas, Dmytro 201-1305 Shinmyung Apt. Youngtong-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Ma, Byung-in 202-1302 Samsung Apt. 419 Yuljeon-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2004/16] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | Robinson, Ian Michael Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256251.4 | 03.10.2003 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | KR20020061084 | 07.10.2002 Original published format: KR 2002061084 | [2004/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1408488 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1408488 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/09, G11B7/085, G11B19/12 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
G11B7/08511 (EP,US);
G11B7/09 (KR);
G11B7/0945 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/16] | G11B7/09 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/35] |
Former [2004/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Adaptives Fokussierungsverfahren und Vorrichtung | [2004/16] | English: | Adaptive focusing method and apparatus | [2004/16] | French: | Procédé et appareil de focalisation adaptatif | [2004/16] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 17.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0813192 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-42 * column 3, line 45 - column 9, line 34 ** figures 1-7 *; | [X]US6449232 (KUWAHARA MASAYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,7,10,13,14,23-25,29,30,34-37 * column 10, line 1 - column 12, line 42 * * column 13, line 45 - column 17, line 22 * * figures 5-13 * | Examination | JPH03165324 | EP0767456 | EP0883113 | EP1460617 |