EP1458055 - Wedge connector tool head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huskie Tools, Inc. 198 North Brandon Drive Glendale Heights Illinois 60139 / US | [2007/18] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Huskie Tools, Inc. 198 North Brandon Drive Glendale Heights, Illinois 60139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itrich, Todd J. 830 Arbor Avenue West Chicago Illinois 60185 / US | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Terence Leslie Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Johnson, Terence Leslie Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London, WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/38] | Johnson, Terence Leslie Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker, Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256399.1 | 10.10.2003 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | US20030386188 | 11.03.2003 Original published format: US 386188 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458055 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1458055 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/50, H01R43/027 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
H01R43/027 (EP,US);
H01R4/5083 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53213 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53222 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53226 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5323 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53235 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53239 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53257 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/22] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Werkzeugkopf für ein Keilverbinder | [2004/38] | English: | Wedge connector tool head | [2004/38] | French: | Tête d'outil pour une clavette de connexion | [2004/38] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 03.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2829549 (DEMLER HENRY W) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 15 - line 18; figure 3 *; | [A]US3212535 (BROSKE WILLIAM F) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]US5281173 (CHERRY HITESH [US], et al) [A] 13,14* column 1, line 39 - line 45 * |