EP1413466 - Vibration damping engine mount for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED 2 Takara-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [2009/48] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Kouji Kanfotoebina 526 903-1, Nakashinden Ebina-shi Kanagawa 243-0422 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Nobukazu Nissansagamiryo A-512 3-4688-1, Sobudai Zama-shi Kanagawa 228-0011 / JP | [2009/39] |
Former [2004/18] | 01 /
Kouji, Yamada Kanfotoebina 526 903-1, Nakashinden Ebina-shi Kanagawa 243-0422 / JP | ||
02 /
Nobukazu, Takahashi Nissansagamiryo A-512 3-4688-1, Sobudai Zama-shi Kanagawa 228-0011 / JP | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/18] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256624.2 | 21.10.2003 | [2004/18] | Priority number, date | JP20020306561 | 22.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002306561 | JP20020306562 | 22.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002306562 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1413466 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1413466 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1413466 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60K5/12 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
F16F15/022 (EP,US);
F02B37/16 (EP,US);
F02B37/164 (EP,US);
F02F7/0082 (EP,US);
F16F13/264 (EP,US);
F02B37/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/23] |
Former [2004/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schwingungsdämpfendes Motorlager für Brennkraftmaschine | [2004/18] | English: | Vibration damping engine mount for internal combustion engine | [2004/18] | French: | Support moteur amortisseur de vibrations pour moteur à combustion interne | [2004/18] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/18] | 03.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11201220 ; | [X]JPH1151110 ; | [X]US5092566 (FREUDENBERG TILLMAN [DE]) [X] 1-5,9-11,13,14 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US6120012 (SHIBATA AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11,13,14 * abstract * * column 9, line 55 - column 11, line 27 * * column 15, line 27 - line 31 * * figures 1,7 *; | [X]US2002109279 (MURAMATSU ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 9-11,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0061] * * figures 1,4,5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11201220 A 19990727 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-5,9-11,13,14 * abstract * * figure 2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990531), vol. 1999, no. 05, & JP11051110 A 19990223 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 9-11,13,14 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * |