EP1414115 - Correcting for near-end crosstalk unbalance caused by deployment of crosstalk compensation on other pairs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commscope Solutions Properties, LLC 1285 Southern Way Sparks, NV 89431 / US | [2007/13] |
Former [2004/18] | For all designated states Avaya Technology Corp. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashim, Amid I. 3900 Sundew Court Plano Texas 75093 / US | [2004/18] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/18] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256703.4 | 23.10.2003 | [2004/18] | Priority number, date | US20020278323 | 23.10.2002 Original published format: US 278323 | [2004/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1414115 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1414115 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/00 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
H01R13/6464 (EP,US);
H01R13/646 (KR);
Y10S439/941 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/03] |
Former [2004/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Korrektur des asymmetrischen nahen Übersprechens veursacht durch die Übersprechkompensation der anderen Paare | [2004/18] | English: | Correcting for near-end crosstalk unbalance caused by deployment of crosstalk compensation on other pairs | [2004/18] | French: | Correction du déséquilibre de diaphonie locale causé par le déploiment de compensation de la diaphonie d'autres paires | [2004/18] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 05.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5700167 (PHARNEY JULIAN ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 15 * * column 5, line 15 - line 34 * * column 6, line 62 - column 8, line 50 * * figures 3-11 *; | [YD]US5967853 (HASHIM AMID I [US]) [YD] 9* column 4, line 11 - line 23 *; | [X]US6023200 (RHEE EUN-SHIN [KR]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 39; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US6089923 (PHOMMACHANH CHANSY [US]) [X] 1-8,10 * column 2, line 33 - line 50 * * column 3, line 13 - line 23 * * column 4, line 44 - line 63 * * column 5, line 58 - column 8, line 29 * * figures 5-19 * [Y] 9 |