EP1418617 - Semiconductor device and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHINKO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 80 Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP | [2007/06] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states Shinko Electric Co. Ltd. 80 Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi, Nagano 381-2287 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sunohara, Masahiro Shinko Electric Ind. Co.,Ltd. 80, Oshimada-machi Nagano-shi Nagano 381-2287 / JP | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2004/20] | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03256994.9 | 05.11.2003 | [2004/20] | Priority number, date | JP20020320980 | 05.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002320980 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1418617 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1418617 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1418617 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/60, H01L23/538, H01L25/065, H01L21/768, H01L23/48 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
H01L25/50 (EP,US);
H01L23/48 (KR);
H01L21/304 (EP,US);
H01L21/31058 (EP,US);
H01L21/6835 (EP,US);
H01L21/76898 (EP,US);
H01L23/481 (EP,US);
H01L23/5389 (EP,US);
H01L24/19 (EP,US);
H01L24/24 (EP,US);
H01L24/82 (EP,US);
H01L24/92 (EP);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H01L25/0657 (EP,US);
H01L21/568 (EP,US);
H01L2221/68345 (EP,US);
H01L2224/0231 (EP);
H01L2224/02372 (EP);
H01L2224/04105 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05548 (EP);
H01L2224/05568 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05573 (EP,US);
H01L2224/09181 (EP);
H01L2224/11003 (EP,US);
H01L2224/12105 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (US);
H01L2224/16145 (EP);
H01L2224/16235 (EP);
H01L2224/24011 (EP);
H01L2224/24105 (EP);
H01L2224/24226 (EP);
H01L2224/25171 (EP);
H01L2224/26135 (EP);
H01L2224/73204 (EP);
H01L2224/73259 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81005 (EP,US);
H01L2224/81801 (EP,US);
H01L2224/82005 (EP,US);
H01L2224/9202 (EP);
H01L2224/92224 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06524 (EP,US);
H01L2225/06541 (EP,US);
H01L24/02 (EP);
H01L24/03 (EP);
H01L24/05 (EP);
H01L24/81 (EP);
H01L2924/0001 (EP);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01058 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01073 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01077 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/04941 (EP,US);
H01L2924/04953 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15787 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/9202, H01L2224/81, H01L21/76898 (EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/81 (EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/82 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2924/15311 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0001, H01L2224/02 (EP);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2004/20] | H01L21/60 | Designated contracting states | DE [2005/07] |
Former [2004/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2004/20] | English: | Semiconductor device and method of manufacturing the same | [2004/20] | French: | Composant semiconducteur et méthode de fabrication correspondante | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 17.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP06124616.1 / EP1801866 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2000323645 ; | [X]EP1094511 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,16 * the whole document *; | [DA]US2001004130 (HIGASHI MITSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [DA] 8-23 * the whole document *; | [DA]US2001008794 (AKAGAWA MASATOSHI [JP]) [DA] 8-23 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP1137066 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 8-23; | [XA]EP1154474 (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,16 * paragraphs [0102] - [0108]; figures 11A-11F * * paragraphs [0111] , [0112]; figures 13,15 * [A] 8-15,17-23; | [XA]EP1189272 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,16 * paragraphs [0075] - [0087]; figures 2A-2F,3A,3B * [A] 13-15,21-23; | [X]EP1189273 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0060] - [0063]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2002127839 (UMETSU KAZUSHIGE [JP], et al) [A] 4-7,10-23 * paragraphs [0114] - [0121] - [0143] , [0144] , [0153] , [0178]; figures 1-4,10 *; | [A]EP1248295 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO [JP]) [A] 4-7,10-23 * paragraphs [0022] - [0033]; figures 2-7 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000323645 A 20001124 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DA] 8-23 * abstract * |