EP1439382 - Rotor balancing and drive shaft simulator therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE PLC 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | ||
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robbins, William Edward 35 Gallivan Close, Little Stoke Bristol, BS34 6RW / GB | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Tindall, Adam, et al Rolls Royce plc P.O. Box 3 Filton Bristol BS34 7QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Tindall, Adam, et al Rolls Royce plc P.O. Box 3 Filton Bristol BS34 7QE / GB | ||
Former [2009/27] | Tindall, Adam, et al Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dep., ML9 P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2004/30] | Bird, Vivian John, et al Rolls-Royce plc, Intellectual Property Dept WH 58, P.O. Box 3, Filton Bristol BS34 7QE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257376.8 | 21.11.2003 | [2004/30] | Priority number, date | GB20030000768 | 14.01.2003 Original published format: GB 0300768 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1439382 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1439382 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1439382 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01M1/16 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
G01M13/025 (EP,US);
F16F15/22 (GB);
G01M1/24 (EP,US);
G01M1/32 (GB);
G01M15/00 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/14] |
Former [2004/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rotorauswuchtung und Antriebswellensimulator hierfür | [2004/30] | English: | Rotor balancing and drive shaft simulator therefor | [2004/30] | French: | Equilibrage de rotor et simulateur d'un arbre d'entraînement associé | [2004/30] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 26.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5922952 (MORADI MOHAMMAD ALI [US], et al) | Examination | US3871234 | US5367909 | by applicant | US3871234 | US5367909 |