EP1431250 - Water purification system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barnstead Thermolyne Corporation 2555 Kerper Boulevard Dubuque Iowa 52001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Barnstead Thermolyne Corporation 2555 Kerper Boulevard Dubuque Iowa 52001 / US | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Barnstead Thermolyne Corporation 2555 Kerper Boulevard Dubuque, Iowa 52001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tilp, Joseph T. 2740 Muscatine Street Dubuque, Iowa 52001 / US | 02 /
Willman, Eric J. 4860 Ambassador Court Dubuque, Iowa 52002 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257465.9 | 26.11.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020324214 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 324214 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1431250 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1431250 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | [2004/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431250 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/469, C02F1/44, C02F9/06, C02F9/02, C02F103/04, // C02F1/28 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B01D61/025 (EP,US);
B01D61/04 (EP,US);
C02F1/4691 (EP,US);
C02F9/00 (EP,US);
B01D2311/04 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
C02F1/283 (EP,US);
C02F1/32 (EP,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,US);
C02F2103/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01D2311/04, B01D2311/2623, B01D2311/2626 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/17] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Reinigung von Wasser | [2004/26] | English: | Water purification system and method | [2004/26] | French: | Système et procédé de purification de l'eau | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 19.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.05.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6162361 (ADIGA MAHABALA R [CA]) [A] 1,15 * figure 1 * * column 6, lines 40-62 *; | [A]US6461514 (AL-SAMADI RIAD A [CA]) [A] 1,15 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 8 *; | [A]US6461512 (HIRAYAMA JUNYA [JP], et al) [A] 1* figure 1; example 1 * |