EP1531326 - Material testing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUNMA UNIVERSITY 4-2, Aramaki-machi Maebashi-shi Gunma, 371-8510 / JP | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states GUNMA UNIVERSITY 4-2, Aramaki-machi Mebashi-shi Gunma, 371-8510 / JP | ||
Former [2005/20] | For all designated states President of Gunma University 4-2, Aramaki-machi Mebashi-shi, Gunma, 371-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Yusaku 11-11 Higashi 4-chome Kiryu-shi, Gunma, 376-0034 / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Takao 1113-12, Kizaki, Nitta-machi Nitta-gun, Gunma, 370-0321 / JP | [2005/34] |
Former [2005/20] | 01 /
* * * | ||
02 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2005/20] | Fenlon, Christine Lesley Haseltine Lake, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257550.8 | 01.12.2003 | [2005/20] | Priority number, date | JP20030381385 | 11.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003381385 | [2005/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1531326 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1531326 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/28, G01N3/34, G01N3/06 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
G01B11/161 (EP,US);
G01N3/06 (EP,US);
G01N3/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2006/06] |
Former [2005/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Materialprüfverfahren | [2005/20] | English: | Material testing method | [2005/20] | French: | Méthode d'essai de matériaux | [2005/20] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 16.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3901074 (DOUGLAS BRUCE E) [A] 2,4 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 19 *; | [X]US5284058 (JONES DAVID I G [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 3, lines 11-21 * * column 4, lines 15-57; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0893669 (EURATOM [LU]) [A] 2* column 3, lines 23-36; figure 2 *; | [X]US6324915 (POTTS GERALD R [US]) [X] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1236996 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0029]; figure 1 * |