EP1426022 - Apparatus for advancing synovial fluid in a prosthetic joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Southworth, Carleton B. 760 Heritage Lane Warsaw IN 46582 / US | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2004/24] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257595.3 | 03.12.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | US20020310288 | 05.12.2002 Original published format: US 310288 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1426022 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1426022 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/32, A61F2/36 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
A61F2/30721 (EP,US);
A61F2/36 (EP,US);
A61F2/3609 (EP,US);
A61F2/30723 (EP,US);
A61F2/32 (EP,US);
A61F2/34 (EP,US);
A61F2/3662 (EP,US);
A61F2/367 (EP,US);
A61F2/3676 (EP,US);
A61F2/38 (EP,US);
A61F2/40 (EP,US);
A61F2/4202 (EP,US);
A61F2/4261 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30322 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30474 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30563 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30566 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30589 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30593 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30616 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30673 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30675 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30677 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30683 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30787 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30827 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30939 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3613 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3621 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3625 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3647 (EP,US);
A61F2002/365 (EP,US);
A61F2002/368 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3694 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4635 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/19] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Weiterführung von Synovia in einer Gelenksprothese | [2004/24] | English: | Apparatus for advancing synovial fluid in a prosthetic joint | [2004/24] | French: | Appareil pour avancer le liquide synovial dans une articulation prothétique | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/47] | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.04.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2139878 (HILDEBRANDT JUERGEN J DIPL PHY) [X] 1,9 * page 10 - page 14; figure 2; claims 1-4 * [A] 4; | [A]DE2742464 (PFAUDLER WERKE AG) [A] 10* page 14; figure 12 *; | [A]US5571195 (JOHNSON LANNY L [US]) [A] 2,10,11 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 15; figure 1 *; | [XY]DE10037504 (KRUG H J [DE]) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * [Y] 4; | [Y]US2002143402 (STEINBERG AMIRAM [IL]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0133]; figure 9A * |