EP1432031 - Anti-tampering enclosure for electronic circuitry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verifone Israel Ltd. 11 Haamal Street 48092 Rosh Haayin / IL | [2007/16] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states LIPMAN ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING LTD. 11 Haamal Street Rosh Haayin 48092 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cohen, Yirzhak 4 Jabotinski Street Yahud / IL | 02 /
Aviv, Arnon 4 Kibush Haavoda Herzelia / IL | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss 24 East Street St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Evens, Paul Jonathan, et al Maguire Boss, 5 Crown Street St. Ives, Cambridge PE27 5EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257680.3 | 05.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020326726 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 326726 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1432031 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1432031 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/58 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
H01L23/576 (EP,US);
H05K1/141 (EP,US);
H05K5/0208 (EP,US);
H01H2239/032 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K1/0275 (EP,US);
H05K1/145 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10151 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10189 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1572 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Gehäuse mit Einbruchschutz für elektronische Schaltungen | [2004/26] | English: | Anti-tampering enclosure for electronic circuitry | [2004/26] | French: | Boitier inviolable pour des circuits électroniques | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 14.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.03.2008 | BE | 26.03.2008 | CY | 26.03.2008 | CZ | 26.03.2008 | DK | 26.03.2008 | EE | 26.03.2008 | FI | 26.03.2008 | NL | 26.03.2008 | RO | 26.03.2008 | SI | 26.03.2008 | SK | 26.03.2008 | TR | 26.03.2008 | BG | 26.06.2008 | SE | 26.06.2008 | GR | 27.06.2008 | ES | 07.07.2008 | PT | 01.09.2008 | HU | 27.09.2008 | IE | 05.12.2008 | LU | 05.12.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
TR | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
IE | 05.12.2008 | ||
LU | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
HU | 27.09.2008 | ||
IE | 05.12.2008 | ||
LU | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 05.12.2008 | ||
LU | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CY | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
BG | 26.06.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
EE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
DK | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
NL | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
RO | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SK | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
PT | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SE | 26.06.2008 | ||
ES | 07.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
SI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
BE | 26.03.2008 | ||
FI | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 26.03.2008 | |
FI | 26.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0375545 (BULL SA [FR]) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]US5877547 (RHELIMI ALAIN [FR]) [A] 1-8 * column A; figure 1 *; | [XA]US6438825 (KUHN HARRY A [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 6 - line 49; figures 1-3 * [A] 4-8 |