EP1428667 - Ink jet printer and image recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2009/13] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS, INC. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsutsumi, Takashi 2970 Ishikawa-cho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8505 / JP | 02 /
Ohya, Hidenobu 1, Sakura-machi, Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Shinichi 1, Sakura-machi, Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | 04 /
Yasuda, Minoru 1, Sakura-machi, Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | 05 /
Fukuda, Teruyuki 1, Sakura-machi, Hino-shi Tokyo 191-8511 / JP | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Gover, Richard Paul, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Gover, Richard Paul, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2004/25] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257698.5 | 08.12.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | JP20020359824 | 11.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002359824 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1428667 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1428667 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1428667 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/00, B41J2/205 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
B41J11/002 (EP,US);
B41J11/0015 (EP,US);
B41J11/0022 (EP,US);
B41J11/0024 (EP,US);
B41J2/2056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/30] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldrucker und Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren | [2008/47] | English: | Ink jet printer and image recording method | [2004/25] | French: | Imprimante à jet d'encre et méthode d'enregistrement d'image | [2004/25] |
Former [2004/25] | Tintenstrahldrucker und Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren | Examination procedure | 13.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 21.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08007012.1 / EP1958783 | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH0538818 ; | [A]EP0307251 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-3,5-7,17 * page 6, lines 39-64; figures 3,7 *; | [YA]EP0668165 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1,2,6,7,10,11,13,14,16-19 * column 1, line 19 - column 5, line 55; figures 1,2 * [A] 4,8,9; | [A]US5774155 (MEDIN TODD R [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,17 * column 5, line 47 - column 7, line 16; figure 1 *; | [YA]US6027196 (GOTOH FUMIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 10,11,13,14,16,18,19 * column 14, line 38 - column 15, line 42; figures 20-22 * [A] 12,15; | [YA]GB2361670 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 10,11,13,14,16,18,19 * abstract *[A] 12,15; | [YA]US2002118987 (TAKEKOSHI NOBUHIKO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,6,7,17 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0059] , [0060] , [0069]; figures 1,6,7 * [A] 3-5,8,9 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930621), vol. 017, no. 324, Database accession no. (M - 1433), & JP05038818 A 19930219 (CANON INC) [Y] 10,11,13,14,16,18,19 * abstract * [A] 12,15 |