EP1428924 - Drum type washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2012 | Revocation of patent | published on 08.08.2012 [2012/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Gon Poongho-dong, 664-5, Jinhae-si Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 02 /
Hur, Chi Wan Sinwol-Jukong Apt., 209-205, Sinwol-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 03 /
Kang, Yu Beom A-406, LG Electr. Dormitory, Gaumjung-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 04 /
Je, Sang Man Gohyun-ri 389-5, Shinhyon-up Koje-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 05 /
Choi, Kang Mo Hyundai Apt.,106-1301, Naeseo-eup 253-1, Hoewon-gu Masan-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Jae Kyum Hyundai Apt., 309-1004, Nae-dong Gimhae-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 07 /
Kwon, Ho Cheol Sapa-dong, 89-3 Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/25] | 01 /
Kim, Gon Poongho-dong, 664-5, Jinhae-si Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | ||
02 /
Hur, Chi Wan Sinwol-Jukong Apt., 209-205, Sinwol-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | |||
03 /
Kang, Yu Beom A-406, LG Electr. Dormitory, Gaumjung-dong Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | |||
04 /
Je, Sang Man Gohyun-ri 389-5, Shinhyon-up Koje-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | |||
05 /
Choi, Kang Mo Hyundai Apt.,106-1310, Naeseo-eup 243-1, Hoewon-gu Masan-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | |||
06 /
Kim, Jae Kyum Hyundai Apt., 309-1004, Nae-dong Gimhae-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | |||
07 /
Kwon, Ho Cheol Sapa-dong, 89-3 Changwon-si, Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | Representative(s) | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Neobard, William John, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257739.7 | 09.12.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | KR20020078337 | 10.12.2002 Original published format: KR 2002078337 | KR20030086841 | 02.12.2003 Original published format: KR 2003086841 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1428924 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1428924 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/30 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
D06F37/304 (EP,US);
D06F37/206 (EP,US);
D06F37/262 (EP,US);
D06F37/264 (EP,US);
D06F37/269 (EP,US);
H02K1/148 (EP,US);
H02K1/187 (EP,US);
H02K1/2791 (EP,US);
H02K7/085 (EP,US);
H02K1/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/25] | Title | German: | Trommelwaschmaschine | [2004/25] | English: | Drum type washing machine | [2004/25] | French: | Machine à laver à tambour | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05076795.3 / EP1602767 | EP05076796.1 / EP1602768 | EP05076797.9 / EP1607505 | EP05076798.7 / EP1602769 | EP06008897.8 / EP1707661 | EP06008898.6 / EP1707662 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2008
08.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE Daewoo Electronics Corporation Narakeyum Jeodong Building 1ga Jeodong Junggu Seoul 100-031 / KR Opponent's representative Scheele, Friedrich, et al, et al Stolmár Scheele & Partner Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2008
08.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE Daewoo Electronics Corporation Narakeyum Jeodong Building 1ga Jeodong Junggu Seoul 100-031 / KR Opponent's representative Scheele, Friedrich, et al, et al Stolmár Scheele & Partner Patentanwälte Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2008
08.10.2008
ADMISSIBLE Daewoo Electronics Corporation Narakeyum Jeodong Building 1ga Jeodong Junggu Seoul 100-031 / KR Opponent's representative Scheele, Friedrich, et al, et al Stolmár Scheele Hinkelmann Blumenstrasse 17 D-80331 München / DE | 20.11.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.05.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.04.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/32] | Appeal following opposition | 28.06.2010 | Appeal received No. T1416/10 | 02.09.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.04.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 03.04.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.04.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.01.2008 | CH | 16.01.2008 | CY | 16.01.2008 | EE | 16.01.2008 | LI | 16.01.2008 | GR | 17.04.2008 | IE | 09.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2009/47] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
IE | 09.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
CY | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
EE | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 16.01.2008 | |
CH | 16.01.2008 | ||
LI | 16.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 16.01.2008 | |
LI | 16.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0620308 (FISHER & PAYKEL [NZ]) [Y] 3,5,9,10,18-24 * column 3, line 4 - column 20, line 41; figures 3,2,5 * [A] 1,2,4,6-8,11-17; | [YA]EP0629735 (FISHER & PAYKEL [NZ]) [Y] 3,5,9,10,18-24 * column 4, line 35 - column 4, line 53; figure 9 * [A] 1,2,4,6-8,11-17; | [A]EP0780506 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [XAY]US5862686 (SKRIPPEK JOERG [DE]) [X] 1,2,11 * column 4, line 14 - column 4, line 67; figure 2 * [A] 4,6-10,12-21,23,24 [Y] 3,5,22; | [XA]EP1079014 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 2,3 * [A] 3-24; | [XAY]EP1094144 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,2,9,11 * column 4, line 15 - column 14, line 45; figures 2B,2C,7 * [A] 4,6-8,10,12-21,23,24 [Y] 3,5,22; | [XA]EP1094145 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-24; | [XA]EP1116812 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * [A] 3-24 |