EP1429147 - Universal reagent for isotopically tagging peptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware Corporation - 5301 Stevens Creek Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | ||
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robotti, Karla M. 1906 Newman Place Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
Apffel, James Alexander Jr. 1925 Limetree Lane Mountain View, California 94040 / US | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Barth, Daniel Mathias, et al Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Hewlett-Packard-Strasse 8 76337 Waldbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Barth, Daniel Mathias, et al Agilent Technologies Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung Herrenberger Strasse 130 71034 Böblingen / DE | ||
Former [2010/02] | Kurz, Peter, et al Agilent Technologies SARL Rue de la Gare 29 1110 Morges / CH | ||
Former [2004/25] | Tollett, Ian, et al Williams Powell Morley House 26-30 Holborn Viaduct London EC1A 2BP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257854.4 | 15.12.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | US20020318845 | 13.12.2002 Original published format: US 318845 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1429147 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/10] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Universale Reagentien zum isotopischen Markieren von Peptiden | [2004/25] | English: | Universal reagent for isotopically tagging peptides | [2004/25] | French: | Reactifs universel pour marquer un peptide avec un isotope | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 04.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0229414 (AMERSHAM BIOSCIENCES AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0242427 (SURROMED INC [US]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [X] - YAMADA H ET AL, "An S-Alkylating Reagent with Positive Charges as an Efficient Solubilizer of Denatured Disulfide-Containing Proteins", JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, JAPANESE BIOCHEMICAL SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (1994), vol. 116, ISSN 0021-924X, pages 852 - 857, XP002192467 [X] 1,4-6,15-19 * the whole document * | [X] - JANDA K D ET AL, "ANTIBODY BAIT AND SWITCH CATALYSIS A SURVEY OF ANTIGENS CAPABLE OF INDUCING ABZYMES WITH ACYL-TRANSFER PROPERTIES", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1991), vol. 113, no. 14, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5427 - 5434, XP001180211 [X] 1-3,15-17,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00014a039 | [X] - BULL J P ET AL, "Development of an immunoassay for a quaternary ammonium compound, benzyldimethyldodecylammonium chloride", WATER RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19981201), vol. 32, no. 12, ISSN 0043-1354, pages 3621 - 3630, XP004144617 [X] 1-6,15,16,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0043-1354(98)00127-4 | [X] - CALVANI ET AL, "L-Carnitine esters as soft, broad-spectrum antimicrobial amphiphiles", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1998), vol. 41, no. 13, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 2227 - 2233, XP002122763 [X] 1,3,15,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm970305x | [X] - LU M Y ET AL, "WATER SOLUBLE DIALKYL PEROXIDES AND PEROXYESTERS", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19950811), vol. 60, no. 16, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 5341 - 5345, XP000517489 [X] 1,3-6,15-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00121a068 | [A] - BRANCIA F L ET AL, "INVESTIGATION OF THE ELECTROSPRAY RESPONE OF LYSINE-,ARGININE-, AND HOMOARGININE-TERMINAL PEPTIDE MIXTURES BY LIQUID CHROMATOGRAPHY/MASS SPECTROMETRY", RAPID COMMUNICATIONS IN MASS SPECTROMETRY, HEYDEN, LONDON, GB, (2002), vol. 16, no. 24, ISSN 0951-4198, pages 2255 - 2259, XP009018848 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/rcm.852 |