EP1432177 - Poll scheduling for periodic traffic sources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avaya Technology Corp. 211 Mount Airy Road Basking Ridge, New Jersey 07920-2332 / US | [2004/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benveniste, Mathilde 76 Harding Drive South Orange, New Jersey 07920-2332 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | McCallum, Graeme David, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | [2011/38] |
Former [2004/26] | McCallum, Graeme David, et al Lloyd Wise, McNeight & Lawrence, Highbank House Exchange Street Stockport, Cheshire SK3 0ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 03257901.3 | 16.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020433604P | 16.12.2002 Original published format: US 433604 P | US20030673702 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: US 673702 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1432177 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1432177 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1432177 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, // H04W74/06, H04W84/12 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
H04W74/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/403 (KR);
H04W84/12 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/18] | H04L12/28, H04L12/403 | ||
Former IPC [2004/26] | H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/02] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pollingzeitplanung für periodische Verkehrsquellen | [2004/26] | English: | Poll scheduling for periodic traffic sources | [2004/26] | French: | Programme d'appel sélectif pour des sources périodiques du trafic | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2002093929 (MANGOLD STEFAN Y [DE], et al) [Y] 2,4,11,13,16,22 * figures 2-5 *[A] 1,3,10,12,14,15,21; | [XAY] - M. CHEIKHROUHOU, J. LABETOULLE, "An Efficient Polling Layer for SNMP", IEEE EXPLORE, Internet, (20000410), pages 477 - 490, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/search/wrapper.jsp?arnumber=830404, (20051028), XP002351804 [X] 1,3,10,12,14,15,21 * page 480, paragraph 3.2 - page 482 * * page 482, paragraph 3.3 - page 484 * [A] 5,17 [Y] 2,4,11,13,16,22 |