EP1548214 - Inertia locking mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Light Vehicle Systems (UK) Ltd Fordhouse Lane, Stirchley Birmingham West Midlands, B30 3BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Light Vehicle Systems (UK) Ltd Fordhouse Lane, Stirchley Birmingham, West Midlands, B30 3BW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ketelsen, Morten Fliederweg 10 64835 Münster / DE | 02 /
Gorton, John Storrs Holme Storrs Park Winderemere Cumbria LA23 3JG / GB | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | Foot, Paul Matthew James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2005/26] | Jones, John Bryn, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03258142.3 | 24.12.2003 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1548214 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/12 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
E05B85/02 (EP);
E05B77/06 (EP);
E05B77/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/12] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Trägheitsverriegelungsvorrichtung | [2005/26] | English: | Inertia locking mechanism | [2005/26] | French: | Mécanisme de verrouillage par inertie | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/07] | 26.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.06.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.06.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.06.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1553411 (MANN ARTUR) [A] 1 * page 1, line 22 - line 25 *; | [Y]US4326111 (JACKMAN PETER R) [Y] 1,2,4-7,11-15 * column 1, line 11 - line 16 *; | [A]US4381829 (MONTARON BERNARD [FR]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 13 - line 19 *; | [Y]DE4117110 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-7,11-15 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 8 * * column 4, line 57 - line 66 * * column 6, line 6 - line 17 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5373752 (SCHLAGWEIN ULRICH [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 49 - line 54 * * column 3, line 60 - line 61 * * figures 2,4 *; | [A]DE19912680 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-7,11-15 * column 2, line 14, paragraph 29 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1355026 (ARVINMERITOR LIGHT VEHICLE SYS [GB]) [A] 3 * column 7, line 34 - line 52 ** figure 1 * |