EP1462657 - Axial flow fan assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Sang Gyu No. 505-2001, WoonamJookong Apt., Woonam-Dong Gwangsan-Gu Kwangju-City / KR | 02 /
Joo, Jae Man No. 712-1501, Sunji Apt., Youngtong-Dong Paldal-Gu Suwon-City Kyungki-Do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Seung Bae No. 10-301, Kumho Apt., Yonghyn-5-Dong Nam-gu Inchon-City / KR | [2007/07] |
Former [2005/50] | 01 /
Jung, Sang Gyu No. 505-2001, Woonamjookong Apt., Woonam-Dong Gwangsan-Gu Kwangju-City / KR | ||
02 /
Joo, Jae Man No. 712-1501, Sunji Apt., Youngtong-Dong Paldal-Gu Suwon-City Kyungki-Do / KR | |||
03 /
Lee, Seung Bae No. 10-301, Kumho Apt., Yonghyn-5-Dong Nam-gu Inchon-City / KR | |||
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
Jung, Sang Gyu No. 505-2001, Woonamjookong Apt., Woonam-Dong Gwangsan-Gu Kwangju-City / KR | ||
02 /
Joo, Jae Man No. 712-1501, Sunji Apt., Youngtong-Dong Paldal-Gu Suwon-City Kyungki-Do / KR | |||
03 /
Lee, Seung Bae No. 10301, Kumbo Apt., Yonghyn-5-Dong Nam-gu Inchon-City / KR | Representative(s) | Waddington, Richard, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Waddington, Richard, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03258179.5 | 23.12.2003 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | KR20030019470 | 28.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003019470 | KR20030019797 | 29.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003019797 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462657 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462657 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/32 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
F04D29/164 (EP,US);
F04D29/326 (EP,US);
F04D29/662 (EP,US);
Y10S416/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Axiallüftereinheit | [2004/40] | English: | Axial flow fan assembly | [2004/40] | French: | Ventilateur axial | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0933534 (SIEMENS CANADA LTD [CA]) [X] 1,2,6,11,13 * page 2, line 14 - line 39 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US6241474 (ALIZADEH AHMAD [US], et al) [A] 1,11,13* the whole document *; | [X]WO0238962 (BOSCH ROBERT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,11,13 * page 5, line 4 - line 14 * * figure 6 * |