EP1437888 - Video recording and reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jong-phil 203, 101-8 Maetan-1-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kang, Yun-ju 721-1003 Salgugol 7 danji Apt. Yeongtog-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Chang-rok 313-307 Jugong Apartment Gaepo 2-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2004/29] | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner, Shipley & Co., 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 03258187.8 | 23.12.2003 | [2004/29] | Priority number, date | KR20030000654 | 06.01.2003 Original published format: KR 2003000654 | KR20030002812 | 15.01.2003 Original published format: KR 2003002812 | KR20030009600 | 15.02.2003 Original published format: KR 2003009600 | KR20030013812 | 05.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003013812 | KR20030014965 | 11.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003014965 | KR20030015533 | 12.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003015533 | KR20030016409 | 17.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003016409 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1437888 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1437888 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/76 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [2008/30] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Videoaufzeichnungs- und -wiedergabegerät | [2004/29] | English: | Video recording and reproducing apparatus | [2004/29] | French: | Dispositif d'enregistrement et de reproduction de signaux vidéo | [2004/29] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 15.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09121368 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 2-5 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2001092602 (KOWA CO) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]KR100322551B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 2,4,5* the whole document * |