EP1435689 - Method and circuitry for reducing the skew between two signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
GB
Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | For:FR
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE Avenue Bel Air BP5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cedex, Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | For:DE
GB
Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | ||
For:FR
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE Avenue Bel Air BP5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cedex, Nice / FR | |||
Former [2007/35] | For:DE
GB
Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | ||
For:FR
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE Avenue Bel Air BP5 06271 Villeneuve Loubet Cedex, Nice / FR | |||
Former [2004/28] | For:DE
GB
Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | ||
For:FR
TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE B.P. 5 06270 Villeneuve Loubet / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jiguet, Jean-Christophe 1536 Avenue Jules Grec 06600 Antibes / FR | 02 /
Coppola, Francesco Res Anthala F1, 230 Chemin de St. Claude 05500 Antibes / FR | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Holt, Michael, et al Texas Instruments Limited European Patents Department 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | ||
Former [2004/28] | Holt, Michael, et al European Patents Department, Texas Instruments Limited, PO Box 5069 Northampton NN4 7ZE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03290003.7 | 02.01.2003 | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435689 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435689 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/13, H03L7/081, H04J3/04, H04L7/033 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
H04L7/10 (EP,US);
G06F1/10 (EP,US);
H03K5/135 (EP,US);
H04L7/0037 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/13] |
Former [2004/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordung zur Verminderung einer Taktverschiebung zwischen zwei Signalen | [2004/28] | English: | Method and circuitry for reducing the skew between two signals | [2004/28] | French: | Procédé et circuit pour réduire le décalage d'horloge entre deux signaux | [2004/28] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 15.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Request for further processing for: | 08.05.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.06.2007 | Decision despatched | 10.02.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 10.02.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.02.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4814879 (MCNEELY DAVID L [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 20 - line 24 * * column 4, line 32 - line 34 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 3 *; | [A]EP0831588 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 18 *; | [A]FR2768575 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [Y]DE19920335 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 3-5,8-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - line 9 * * column 2, line 19 - line 24 * * column 2, line 55 - line 62 * * column 3, line 1 - line 9 * * column 4, line 41 - line 43 *; | [XA]US6192092 (DIZON ROMMEL O [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8 * abstract * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 54 - line 56 * [A] 2,4,5,7,9,10; | [XY]US2002191719 (HASAKO SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] - [0019] - [0035] , [0077] , [0089] * [Y] 3-5,8-10 |