EP1325911 - Method for preparing 3-methylindole derivatives through hydrogenation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Corporation 99, Seorin dong, Jongro-ku Seoul 110-110 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states SK Corporation 99, Seorin dong, Jongro-ku Seoul 110-110 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kwak, Byong-Sung 212-901, Expo Apt., Jeonmin-dong Yusung-gu, Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 02 /
Kim, Tae-Yun 106-1003, Sejong Apt., Jeonmin-dong Yusung-gu, Daejeon 305-728 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Jin-Woong 103-1404, Expo Apt., Jeonmin-dong Yusung-gu, Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 04 /
Lee, Sang-II 106-1701, Chunggunare Apt., Jeonmin-dong yusung-gu, Daejeon 305-729 / KR | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290021.9 | 06.01.2003 | [2003/28] | Priority number, date | KR20020000734 | 07.01.2002 Original published format: KR 2002000734 | [2003/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1325911 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/08, C07D209/12 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
C07D209/08 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P20/584 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/14] |
Former [2003/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Methode zur Herstellung von 3-Methylindol-Derivate durch Hydrierung | [2003/28] | English: | Method for preparing 3-methylindole derivatives through hydrogenation | [2003/28] | French: | Méthode de préparation de dérivés du 3-methylindole par hydrogénation | [2003/28] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.02.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.02.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63297363 ; | [A] - LAU C K ET AL, "Reductive deoxygenation of Arly Aldehydes and Ketones and Benzylic Allylic and Tertiary Alcohols by ZnI2-NaCNBH3", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (1986), vol. 51, no. 15, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 3038 - 3043, XP002190753 [A] 1-9 * example 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00365a034 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890404), vol. 013, no. 134, Database accession no. (C - 581), & JP63297363 A 19881205 (NIPPON STEEL CHEM CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |