EP1450185 - Device for unhooking of an LC connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2004/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oreglio, Maurizio Via Malenza, 15 20060 Bellinzago Lombardo (Milano) / IT | 02 /
Crippa, Roberto Via Italia, 2/B 23845 Costa Masnaga (Lecco) / IT | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Menzietti, Domenico, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department Via Trento 30 20059 Vimercate (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Menzietti, Domenico, et al Alcatel Intellectual Property Department, Via Trento, 30 20059 Vimercate (Milano) / IT | Application number, filing date | 03290423.7 | 21.02.2003 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1450185 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450185 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
G02B6/3893 (EP,US);
G02B6/3879 (EP,US);
G02B6/3897 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Entrasten eines LC Steckers | [2004/35] | English: | Device for unhooking of an LC connector | [2004/35] | French: | Outil pour détacher un connecteur LC | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 11.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.08.2005 | BE | 03.08.2005 | CH | 03.08.2005 | CY | 03.08.2005 | CZ | 03.08.2005 | EE | 03.08.2005 | FI | 03.08.2005 | LI | 03.08.2005 | NL | 03.08.2005 | SI | 03.08.2005 | SK | 03.08.2005 | TR | 03.08.2005 | BG | 03.11.2005 | DK | 03.11.2005 | GR | 03.11.2005 | SE | 03.11.2005 | PT | 03.01.2006 | HU | 04.02.2006 | IE | 21.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2005 | ||
EE | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SK | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
HU | 04.02.2006 | ||
IE | 21.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2005 | ||
EE | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SK | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
IE | 21.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SK | 03.08.2005 | ||
TR | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SK | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/29] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SK | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
DK | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
BE | 03.08.2005 | ||
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
PT | 03.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
CH | 03.08.2005 | ||
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
LI | 03.08.2005 | ||
NL | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
GR | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 03.08.2005 | |
FI | 03.08.2005 | ||
SI | 03.08.2005 | ||
BG | 03.11.2005 | ||
SE | 03.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5159652 (GRASSIN D ALPHONSE EMMANUEL [FR], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 5, line 15 - line 43 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0709927 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * page 3, line 46 - page 4, line 45 * * figures 1A-D *; | [A]US5603631 (KAWAHARA AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 5, paragraph 5 - column 6, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]EP0967500 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 ** column 6, line 39 - column 7, line 20 * |