EP1460571 - Methods relating to agenda planning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riche, Stephanie 13, rue de la Republique 38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Brebner, Gavin 191 route de Pierval 38410 St. Martin D'Uriage / FR | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett Packard Espanola, SL Legal Department Cami de Can Graells, 1-21 08174 Saint Cugat del Vallés Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett Packard CCF IP Section - Legal Department 5, Avenue Raymond Chanas-Eybens 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2004/39] | Lloyd, Richard Graham Hewlett-Packard France Intellectual Property Section Etablissement de Grenoble 38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290675.2 | 18.03.2003 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1460571 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren für Terminkalenderplanung | [2004/39] | English: | Methods relating to agenda planning | [2004/39] | French: | Procédés pour planification d'agenda | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/17] | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/29] | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1109121 (ALCATEL USA SOURCING LP [US]) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - line 55 *; | [X]EP1197893 (KOH SOON JONG [KR]) [X] 1-19* abstract * |