EP1371795 - Sliding wing with operating handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/51] | Operating handle for sliding wing | ||
[2008/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment 2, rue du Vieux Moulin 57445 Réding / FR | [2008/40] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Ferco International Ferrures et Serrures de Bâtiment 2, rue du Vieux Moulin 57445 Réding / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alvarez, Eric 9, rue Gallo-Romaine 57870 Hommert / FR | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain, et al Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Rhein, Alain, et al Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 8, Avenue Pierre Mendès France 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | ||
Former [2003/51] | Keib, Gérard Pontet Allano & Associés S.E.L.A.R.L. 6 avenue du Général de Gaulle 78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290711.5 | 20.03.2003 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | FR20020007350 | 14.06.2002 Original published format: FR 0207350 | [2003/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1371795 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1371795 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05B1/00 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
E05B1/00 (EP);
E05B1/0015 (EP);
E05B65/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/51] | Title | German: | Schiebeflügel mit Betätigungshandhabe | [2008/12] | English: | Sliding wing with operating handle | [2008/12] | French: | Ouvrant coulissant avec une poignée de manoeuvre | [2008/12] |
Former [2003/51] | Betätigungshandhabe für Schiebeflügel | ||
Former [2003/51] | Operating handle for sliding wing | ||
Former [2003/51] | Poignée de manoeuvre pour ouvrant coulissant | Examination procedure | 16.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 28.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.10.2008 | CY | 01.10.2008 | CZ | 01.10.2008 | DK | 01.10.2008 | EE | 01.10.2008 | FI | 01.10.2008 | IE | 01.10.2008 | IT | 01.10.2008 | NL | 01.10.2008 | RO | 01.10.2008 | SI | 01.10.2008 | SK | 01.10.2008 | TR | 01.10.2008 | BG | 01.01.2009 | SE | 01.01.2009 | GR | 02.01.2009 | PT | 02.03.2009 | GB | 20.03.2009 | LU | 20.03.2009 | ES | 21.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | HU | 02.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 20.03.2009 | ||
LU | 20.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
HU | 02.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 20.03.2009 | ||
LU | 20.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 20.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 20.03.2009 | ||
ES | 21.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 20.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
SE | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
RO | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IE | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/16] | SI | 01.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4754624 (FLEMING PAUL D [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 10 * * figures 2,8,17 *; | [X]EP0276972 (ROLLS ROYCE MOTOR CARS [GB]) [X] 1,3,4 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0309239 (WIGAN MOTOR PANELS [GB]) [X] 1,4,5,7,10 * column 3, line 30 - line 41 * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US4998757 (RAMSAUER DIETER [DE]) [A] 2,4,5,7-9,13,15 * column 5, line 26 - line 30 * * column 6, line 11 - line 31 ** figures 1,3,13A *; | [XD]GB2286854 (DOWELL AUSTRALIA [AU]) [XD] 1,3-5,10 * page 5, line 11 - line 26 * * figures 1-6,13 *; | [AD]EP0802288 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [AD] 1,3,4,6,7 * column 2, line 32 - line 46 * * column 3, line 14 - line 19 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO0140607 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7,10,11 * page 6, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 4 *; | [XD]DE20113035U (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1,2,10-12 * page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 4 * * figures 1,2 * |