EP1357206 - Anodisation process of an aluminium alloy element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Messier-Bugatti-Dowty Inovel Parc Sud 78140 Vélizy-Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Messier-Bugatti-Dowty Inovel Parc Sud 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | ||
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states Messier-Bugatti Zone Aéronautique Louis Bréguet 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viola, Alain 34, rue Saint-Urbain 67100 Strasbourg / FR | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Jaunez, Xavier, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Jaunez, Xavier, et al Cabinet Boettcher, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290776.8 | 27.03.2003 | [2003/44] | Priority number, date | FR20020004984 | 22.04.2002 Original published format: FR 0204984 | [2003/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1357206 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1357206 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/08, C25D11/10, C25D11/12 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
C25D11/08 (EP,US);
C25D11/10 (EP,US);
C25D11/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anodisation eines Aluminiumlegierungelements | [2003/44] | English: | Anodisation process of an aluminium alloy element | [2003/44] | French: | Procédé d'anodisation d'une pièce en alliage d'aluminium | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 09.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2000026997 ; | [XA]US2855350 (ROBERT ERNST) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 38 - column 8, line 18 * [A] 6; | [A]US3563867 (KAPE JAMES M, et al) [A] 1-5,8,9 * column 1, lines 31-40 * * claim 1 * * column 2, lines 5-59 *; | [AD]US4554216 (MOHR DIETER [DE]) [AD] 1-3,8,9,12,13 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 32 *; | [XD]US4894127 (WONG CHUN-MING [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,8,9,12,13 * column 1, lines 10-27,55 - column 2, lines 6,22-32 * * column 3, lines 26-32 * * claim - *; | [XA]EP1233084 (ALENIA AERONAUTICA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,10-12 * examples 1-3 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0010] , [0011] , [0014] * [A] 6; | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000026997 A 20000125 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] - [0066] * * figure 14 * | [A] - TECHNISCHE VERFAHREN DER ANODISCHEN OXIDATION, PRAXIS DER ANODISCHEN OXIDATION DES ALUMINIUMS, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 137-173, XP008003644 [A] 1,6,7,10,11 * pages 151-152 * * page 157 * |