EP1353332 - Apparatus and method for preparing modified data to prevent unauthorized reading/execution of original data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUDSON SOFT CO., LTD. 5-4-22, Hiragishi 3 JO, Toyohira-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkaido / JP | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriya-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Hudson Soft Co., Ltd. 5-4-22, Hiragishi 3 JO, Toyohira-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | ||
For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 3-12, Moriya-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yonekawa, Masaki 4-7-17-201, Hiragishi 4-jo, Toyohira-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | 02 /
Hirayoshi, Takuma 302 Riessent Satozuka 3-2-40, Satokuza 1-jo, Kiyota-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido / JP | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03290913.7 | 11.04.2003 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | JP20020110109 | 12.04.2002 Original published format: JP 2002110109 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1353332 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/00 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
G11B20/0063 (EP,US);
G06F9/06 (KR);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00927 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/28] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Appareil et procédé de préparation des données modifiées pour empêcher la lecture ou l'exécution non-authorisée des données originelles | [2003/42] | English: | Apparatus and method for preparing modified data to prevent unauthorized reading/execution of original data | [2003/42] | French: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Vorbereiten von veränderten Daten um unberechtigtes Lesen oder Ausführung der ursprünglichen Daten zu verhindern | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 16.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08153331 ; | [X]WO9803973 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9852114 (IMATION CORP [US]) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0899733 (SONY DADC AUSTRIA AG [AT]) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [X]US6104679 (SOLLISH BARUCH [IL]) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0068945 (MACROVISION CORP [US]) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0161695 (MACROVISION EUROP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0180546 (MIDBAR TECH LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO03019552 (BRAINSHIELD TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-28 * abstract * * page 19, paragraph 4 - paragraph 6 * * figure 10 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 1996, no. 10, & JP08153331 A 19960611 (APPLICS:KK) [A] 1-28 * abstract * | [A] - WATKINSON J R, "Subcodes explained", ELECTRONICS & WIRELESS WORLD, REED BUSINESS PUBLISHING, SUTTON, SURREY, GB, (19860901), vol. 92, no. 1607, pages 26 - 30, XP002087131 |