EP1376910 - Optical ring network with uncoupled reading and writing fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | 20.01.2012 | Change - applicant | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/08] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3 avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dotaro, Emmanuel 14, Résidence du Clos 91370 Verrieres Le Buisson / FR | 02 /
La Sauze, Nicolas 151 rue Charles de Gaulle 91440 Bures-sur-Yvette / FR | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Keseris, Denis Alcatel-Lucent International Intellectual Property & Standards 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Keseris, Denis Alcatel-Lucent International Intellectual Property & Standards 32, avenue Kléber 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2004/01] | Sciaux, Edmond Compagnie Financière Alcatel Département de Propriété Industrielle, 5, rue Noel Pons 92734 Nanterre Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291456.6 | 17.06.2003 | [2004/01] | Priority number, date | FR20020007628 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: FR 0207628 | [2004/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1376910 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1376910 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/213, // H04Q11/00 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
H04J14/0227 (EP,US);
H04J14/0241 (EP,US);
H04J14/0283 (EP,US);
H04J14/0226 (EP,US);
H04J14/0291 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/01] | H04B10/213 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | Optisches Ringnetzwerk mit abgekoppelten Lese- und Schreibfasern | [2004/01] | English: | Optical ring network with uncoupled reading and writing fibers | [2004/01] | French: | Réseau optique en anneau a fibres de lecture et d'écritures découplées | [2004/01] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 17.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 05.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0224132 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 19 - line 54 * * column 6, line 8 - column 7, line 10; figure 5 *; | [A]WO9940697 (CHROMATIS NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 1, line 4 - line 10 * * page 2, line 27 - page 5, line 17 * * page 8, line 9 - page 10, line 4; figure 1 * * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 5; figure 2 * * page 15, line 16 - line 22; figure 9 *; | [Y] - WAGNER S S ET AL, "Multiwavelength ring networks for switch consolidation and interconnection", DISCOVERING A NEW WORLD OF COMMUNICATIONS. CHICAGO, JUNE 14 - 18, 1992. BOUND TOGETHER WITH B0190700, VOL. 3, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920614), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-0599-X, pages 1173 - 1179, XP010062090 [Y] 1-19 * page 1175, column L, paragraph 3 - page 1176, column L, paragraph 2; figures 4-6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1992.268130 | [Y] - LIMB J Q ET AL, "PASSIVE UNIDIRECTIONAL BUS NETWORKS USING OPTICAL COMMUNICATIONS", GLOBECOM. NEW ORLEANS, DEC. 2 - 5, 1985; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION (GLOBECOM)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19851201), vol. -, pages 3931 - 3936, XP000810739 [Y] 1-19 * page 3931, column L, paragraph 3 - page 3932, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 3932, column R, paragraph 3 - page 3933, column L, paragraph 2; figure 2 * * page 3933, column R, paragraph 1 - paragraph 4; figure 4 * * page 3934, column L, paragraph 4 - page 3935, column R, paragraph 2; figures 6-8 * | [A] - CHUNG-CHENG LI ET AL, "POPSMAC: A MEDIUM ACCESS PROTOCOL FOR PACKET-SWITCHED PASSIVE OPTICAL NETWORKS USING WDMA", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19930501), vol. 11, no. 5/6, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 1066 - 1077, XP000396734 [A] 10 * page 1066, column R, paragraph 4 - page 1068, column R, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.233270 |