EP1387467 - Window lifter geared motor assembly and window lifter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArvinMeritor Light Vehicle Systems-France 105 route d'Orléans 45600 Sully sur Loire / FR | [2004/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fournier, Gérard 9 allée de Copenahgue 14123 IFS / FR | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Hirsch & Associés 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/06] | Cabinet Hirsch Groupement 161 34, Rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291621.5 | 01.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | FR20020009684 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: FR 0209684 | [2004/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387467 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02K11/00, H02K7/116, E05F15/00 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
E05F15/41 (EP,US);
H02K11/21 (EP,US);
H02K11/24 (EP,US);
H02K7/1166 (EP,US);
E05F15/697 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/434 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/11 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/422 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/06] | Title | German: | Fensterheberantrieb und Fensterheber | [2004/06] | English: | Window lifter geared motor assembly and window lifter | [2004/06] | French: | Motoreducteur de lève-vitre et lève-vitre | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 13.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/01] | 26.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB544458 (WILMOT BREEDEN LTD, et al) [X] 1-7,10-12 * page 1, line 9 - line 15; figure 3 * * page 2, line 35 - line 38 * * page 3, line 53 - line 75 *; | [X]FR1294614 (KLAUS ESSER BAU UND INDUSTRIEB) [X] 1,2 * page 2, column 1, line 23 - column 2, line 45 *; | [X]US4372180 (BOLLINGER JR PARKER A) [X] 1* abstract * |