EP1380984 - Method and apparatus for supporting a biometric registration performed on an authentication server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACTIVCARD IRELAND LIMITED 30 Herbert Street Dublin 2 / IE | [2004/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hillhouse, Robert D. Unit 4B, 120 Holland Avenue Ottawa Ontario K1Y 0X6 / CA | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/03] | Colas, Jean-Pierre Cabinet JP Colas 37, avenue Franklin D. Roosevelt 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291688.4 | 07.07.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | US20020189526 | 08.07.2002 Original published format: US 189526 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1380984 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1380984 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380984 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, H04L9/32, G07F7/10 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G06V40/1365 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/03] | G06K9/00, G07C9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/08] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Unterstützen einer biometrischen Registrierung, die auf einem Authentifizierungsserver ausgeführt wird | [2004/03] | English: | Method and apparatus for supporting a biometric registration performed on an authentication server | [2004/03] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour faciliter un enregistrement biometrique effectué sur un serveur d'authentification | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5802199 (PARE JR DAVID FERRIN [US], et al) [A] 1-90 * abstract * * claim 13 *; | [A]US6167517 (GILCHRIST GARY [US], et al) [A] 1-90* abstract *; | [DXA]WO0184494 (PRECISE BIOMETRICS AB [SE], et al) [DX] 29,60 * abstract * * page 19, lines 5-23 * * page 20, lines 26-35 * * page 25, lines 14-27 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 1-28,30-59,61-90; | [E]EP1385118 (ACTIVCARD IRELAND LTD [IE]) [E] 29,30,60 * the whole document * |