EP1380618 - Olefinic resin composition and coated electric wire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | ||
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Sumimoto Wiring Systems, Ltd 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Masashi, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-ken, Mie 510-8503 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto Shinichi, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Sys., Ltd. 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-ken, Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Uchida, Kenji, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/03] | Uchida, Kenji, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot et Autres Conseils en Propriété Industrielle, 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291712.2 | 09.07.2003 | [2004/03] | Priority number, date | JP20020199797 | 09.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002199797 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380618 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/10, C08K3/22, C08K9/04, H01B3/00 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
H01B3/441 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C08L2023/42 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L2203/202 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
C08L2205/035 (EP,US);
C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/10, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L51/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2004/41] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Olefinharz und daraus hergestellter mit Gummi überzogener Leitungsdraht | [2004/03] | English: | Olefinic resin composition and coated electric wire | [2004/03] | French: | Composition polyoléfinique et un fil électrique gainé de caoutchouc | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 02.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0015710 (ALUSUISSE MARTINSWERK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12* abstract *; | [A]WO0161711 (PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 14, lines 27-37 *; | [Y]EP1215685 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2, line 38 *; | [X]US6414059 (KOBAYASHI KAZUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-30 * * column 14, lines 41-57 * * column 15, line 35 * * column 17, lines 22-58 * * column 20, line 4 * * column 8, line 41 *; | [Y] - MURPHY J, Flame retardants: trends and new developments, REINFORCED PLASTICS, ELSEVIER ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, VOL. 45, NR. 10, PAGE(S) 42-46, ISSN 0034-3617, XP004331931 [Y] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0034-3617(01)80388-X |