EP1385244 - Box for electrical apparatus to be placed alongside a cable duct [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Legrand France 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | For all designated states Legrand SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre-de-Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Legrand France 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states Legrand SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | |||
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states LEGRAND FRANCE 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | ||
For all designated states LEGRAND SNC 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | |||
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states LEGRAND FRANCE 128, avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny 87000 Limoges / FR | ||
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states LEGRAND 128, Avenue du Maréchal de Lattre de Tassigny F-87045 Limoges Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adam, Damien 24, Vieux Chemin du Mans 72240 Domfront en Champagne / FR | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Stankoff, Hélène Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Stankoff, Hélène Santarelli, 14 avenue de la Grande Armée, BP237 75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2004/05] | Stankoff, Hélène Santarelli, 14 avenue de la Grande Armée, BP237 F-75822 Paris 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291847.6 | 25.07.2003 | [2004/05] | Priority number, date | FR20020009518 | 26.07.2002 Original published format: FR 0209518 | [2004/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1385244 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1385244 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/10 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
H02G3/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, IT, PT, TR [2004/43] |
Former [2004/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dose für elektrisches Gerät zur Montage entlang eines Kabelkanals | [2004/05] | English: | Box for electrical apparatus to be placed alongside a cable duct | [2004/05] | French: | Boîtier pour appareillage électrique à rapporter le long d'une goulotte | [2004/05] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 24.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 28.01.2013 | [2013/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5861576 (LANGSTON DANIEL A [US], et al) [DA] 1* figure - *; | [A]EP0921617 (LEGRAND SA [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * |