EP1387474 - Supply circuit for the control element of an active electronic power component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL POLYTECHNIQUE DE GRENOBLE 46, Avenue Félix Viallet 38031 Grenoble Cédex 1 / FR | [2013/01] |
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Institut National Polytechnique De Grenoble 46, Avenue Félix Viallet 38031 Grenoble Cédex 1 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crebier, Jean-Christophe 4 Rue Colbert 38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Schaeffer, Christian 55 Allée de Champ Vérida 38730 Le Pin / FR | [2004/06] | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [2013/01] |
Former [2004/06] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03291854.2 | 25.07.2003 | [2004/06] | Priority number, date | FR20020009645 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: FR 0209645 | [2004/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1387474 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1387474 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/096 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
H02M1/096 (EP);
H03K17/08142 (EP);
H03K2217/0081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/44] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Versorgungsschaltung für das Schaltelement eines aktiven elektronischen Leistungselementes | [2004/06] | English: | Supply circuit for the control element of an active electronic power component | [2004/06] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation d'un élément de commande d'un composant électronique de puissance actif | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 18.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 05.12.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 05.12.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.12.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2013 | IT | 02.01.2013 | ES | 13.04.2013 | GB | 25.07.2013 | FR | 31.07.2013 | [2014/24] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
GB | 25.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
ES | 13.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0351898 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [A]US5347166 (SCHAUDER COLIN D [US]) [A] 1-4,6-12,14 * abstract * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 23 * * column 5, line 5 - column 6, line 60 *; | [A]EP0868014 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10045093 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,11,14 * the whole document * | Examination | US5455758 |