EP1388395 - Fastener collation strip for a fastener driving tool and the combination of such a strip with the magazine section of the tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gupta, Harish C. 8S251 Aintree Drive Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/07] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Cabinet Bloch & Associés 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03291883.1 | 29.07.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | US20020212290 | 05.08.2002 Original published format: US 212290 | [2004/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1388395 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1388395 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/18, F16B15/08 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
B25C1/184 (EP,US);
F41A9/79 (KR);
F16B15/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/07] | Title | German: | Verbindungsstreifen mit Nägeln für Nagelgerät und Kombination eines solchen Streifens mit dem Magazinteil des Werkzeugs | [2004/07] | English: | Fastener collation strip for a fastener driving tool and the combination of such a strip with the magazine section of the tool | [2004/07] | French: | Bande pourvue d'éléments de fixation pour pistolet à clouer et combinaison d'une telle bande avec la partie magasin d'outil | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 22.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 27.09.2006 | CY | 27.09.2006 | CZ | 27.09.2006 | EE | 27.09.2006 | FI | 27.09.2006 | LI | 27.09.2006 | RO | 27.09.2006 | SI | 27.09.2006 | SK | 27.09.2006 | TR | 27.09.2006 | BG | 27.12.2006 | SE | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.12.2006 | PT | 13.03.2007 | HU | 28.03.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | CH | 27.09.2006 | |
CY | 27.09.2006 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CH | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
EE | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CH | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CH | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CH | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
RO | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CH | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
IT | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | CH | 27.09.2006 | |
CZ | 27.09.2006 | ||
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
LI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SK | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 27.09.2006 | |
FI | 27.09.2006 | ||
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 27.09.2006 | |
SI | 27.09.2006 | ||
BG | 27.12.2006 | ||
SE | 27.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0502667 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [DA] 1,9,12* column 9, lines 47-58; figure - *; | [A]US5931622 (GUPTA HARISH C [US], et al) [A] 1,8-10,12 * figures 1-5 *; | [DA]US6044972 (ROHRMOSER GUENTER [AT], et al) [DA] 1,5-7,12 * column 1, lines 57-65; figure - * |