EP1418343 - Control means for an integrated electrohydraulic actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSB S.A.S 4, Allée des Barbanniers 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [2004/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duboy, Dominique 91, rue de Canteloup 33170 Gradignan / FR | 02 /
Galindo, Jean-François Avenue Savorgnan de Brazza 33520 Bruges / FR | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Eidelsberg, Olivier Nathan, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Eidelsberg, Olivier, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03292697.4 | 29.10.2003 | [2004/20] | Priority number, date | FR20020013931 | 07.11.2002 Original published format: FR 0213931 | [2004/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1418343 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1418343 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F15B1/26, F04B23/02, F15B21/08 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
F15B13/0853 (EP);
F15B9/07 (KR);
F04B23/023 (EP);
F15B1/26 (EP);
F15B11/17 (EP);
F15B13/0857 (EP);
F15B13/0889 (EP);
F15B13/0892 (EP);
F15B21/08 (EP);
F15B2211/7142 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | LT | 12.11.2004 | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung eines integrierten, elektrohydraulischen Stellgliedes | [2004/20] | English: | Control means for an integrated electrohydraulic actuator | [2004/20] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'un actionneur électro-hydraulique intégré | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2006 | CZ | 19.07.2006 | SI | 19.07.2006 | SK | 19.07.2006 | LU | 29.10.2006 | HU | 20.01.2007 | [2008/37] |
Former [2008/32] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
HU | 20.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
IT | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
SK | 19.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 19.07.2006 | |
CZ | 19.07.2006 | ||
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CZ | 19.07.2006 | |
SI | 19.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 19.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9300513 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-4* abstract *; | [X]EP0665381 (PLEIGER MASCHF PAUL [DE]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * column 1, line 24 - line 26 * * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 4 * * column 9, line 47 - column 10, line 30 * * column 10, line 38 - column 11, line 34 * * figures 1,5-9 *; | [A]WO9811357 (ETREMA PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 12 - line 21 * * page 6, line 12 - line 20 * * page 10, line 27 - line 39 * * figures 3,7 * |