EP1431208 - Packaging tray [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lechelle, Bernard 205, Route d'Arras 59155 Faches-Thumesnil / FR | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Leray, Noelle L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Leray, Noelle L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 03292884.8 | 20.11.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | FR20020016386 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: FR 0216386 | [2004/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431208 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431208 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/22, B65D75/24 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
B65D75/24 (EP);
B65D75/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Verpackungsschale | [2004/26] | English: | Packaging tray | [2004/26] | French: | Barquette pour le conditionnement d'un article | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 07.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2007 | CY | 01.08.2007 | CZ | 01.08.2007 | DK | 01.08.2007 | EE | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | IE | 01.08.2007 | NL | 01.08.2007 | RO | 01.08.2007 | SI | 01.08.2007 | SK | 01.08.2007 | TR | 01.08.2007 | BG | 01.11.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | GR | 02.11.2007 | LU | 20.11.2007 | BE | 30.11.2007 | CH | 30.11.2007 | LI | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | PT | 02.01.2008 | HU | 02.02.2008 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
LU | 20.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
CH | 30.11.2007 | ||
LI | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
CH | 30.11.2007 | ||
LI | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
CH | 30.11.2007 | ||
LI | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
CH | 30.11.2007 | ||
LI | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
CH | 30.11.2007 | ||
LI | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
CH | 30.11.2007 | ||
LI | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
PT | 02.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
IE | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
DK | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
GR | 02.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
NL | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 01.08.2007 | |
BG | 01.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2557540 (SCHNEIDER MAX) [A] 1,3,4,7,8,10-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0158429 (SMITH PETER LEONARD) [A] 1,3,4,7,8,10-12* abstract * |