EP1535557 - Basting brush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastrad 12, rue du Quatre Septembre 75002 Paris / FR | [2005/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lion, Mathieu c/o MASTRAD 12 rue du 4 Septembre 75002 Paris / FR | 02 /
Bignon, Lucas 60 rue Etienne Dolet 94230 Cachan / FR | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Plaçais, Jean Yves, et al Cabinet Netter 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Plaçais, Jean Yves, et al Cabinet Netter, 36, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/22] | Texier, Christian Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03292953.1 | 27.11.2003 | [2005/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535557 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/10, A46B11/00 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
A46B7/04 (EP,US);
A46B11/0041 (EP,US);
A47J43/005 (EP,US);
A46B2200/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Title | German: | Begiessbürste | [2005/22] | English: | Basting brush | [2005/22] | French: | Pinceau culinaire | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/04] | 26.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 10.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   09.02.2010 | 30.11.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE597195 (ALFRED ARNEGGER) [X] 1-7,11,12,14-16,20,21,26,28,29 * the whole document *; | [X]GB889139 (ERIC JOHN HOSIE, et al) [X] 1-12,20,22,23,27 * figures 1,2 * * page 2, line 6 - line 8 ** page 2, line 40 - line 44 *; | [XD]US3029464 (SPRINGMEIER ROBERT W) [XD] 1-12,17-19,24,29,30 * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 54 - line 66 * * column 2, line 23 - line 28 *; | [X]GB2319169 (JONES STEPHEN HENRY [GB]) [X] 1-11,13,20,24,25,28-30 * abstract * * figures 1,5 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 6 * * claims 9,15 * | by applicant | US3029464 | DE9400551U | US5787799 | US5934187 | USD455559S | USD456615S | USD458760S | USD465336S |