EP1428963 - Stay and locking device for at least one wing of a device such as a window or a door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SO.CO.NA. 5, rue des Artisans 37300 Joue Les Tours / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Socona 5 rue des Artisans 37300 Joue Les Tours / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Enet, Philippe 35 rue des Cicottées 37550 Saint Avertin / FR | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Coester, Jacques Charles Cabinet Madeuf 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Coester, Jacques Charles Cabinet Madeuf 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03293078.6 | 09.12.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | FR20020015603 | 10.12.2002 Original published format: FR 0215603 | [2004/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1428963 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05C17/40, E05C17/18 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
E05C17/40 (EP);
E05C17/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GB, IT [2005/10] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Feststeller und Verschluss für mindestens einen Flügel einer Vorrichtung wie eines Fensters oder einer Tür | [2004/25] | English: | Stay and locking device for at least one wing of a device such as a window or a door | [2004/25] | French: | Système entrebaîlleur et de condamnation d'au moins un ouvrant d'un dispositif tel qu'une fenêtre ou une porte | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/46] | 17.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.04.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/23] | 16.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/23] | Request for further processing for: | 19.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 17.10.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.10.2006 | Decision despatched | 18.10.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 28.10.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB258119 (JAMES REDMOND) [X] 1,2,9 * page 1, line 64 - page 2, line 13 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 6; | [A]GB282564 (HARRY VOLLER NORRIS GRAVELEY) [A] 6 * page 2, line 86 - line 107 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB616670 (C W NORRIS LTD, et al) [A] 1,2,4-6,9 * page 2, line 19 - line 27 * * page 2, line 51 - line 57 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]DE2507770 (F W LUELING KG) [X] 1,2,9 * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]GB1482622 (CROMPTON NETTLEFOLD STENMAN) [A] 10 * column 2, line 89 - column 3, line 2 ** figures 3,4 *; | [X]GB2162242 (RANKIN BRIAN) [X] 1,9 * page 1, line 129 - page 2, line 108 * * figures 2,6,713,14 *; | [X]EP0684358 (PLAST AB A [SE]) [X] 1,2,9 * page 3, line 19 - line 32 * * figures 1-4 *; | [XA]FR2726852 (CUIVRERIE CENTRALE [FR]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 35 - page 9, line 4 * * figure 1 * [A] 7; | [A]EP1167668 (MANINI VITTORIO [IT]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 54 * * figures 7-12 * |