EP1431591 - Threaded fastener with a primary and a dual secondary threads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LeVey, Kenneth R. 943 WIld Ginger Trail West Chicago, Illinois 60185 / US | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Bloch & Bonnétat 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/26] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Cabinet Bloch & Associés 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 03293213.9 | 18.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | US20020323265 | 18.12.2002 Original published format: US 323265 | US20030438228P | 06.01.2003 Original published format: US 438228 P | US20030413751 | 15.04.2003 Original published format: US 413751 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431591 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431591 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16B25/00, F16B25/10, F16B33/02 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F16B33/02 (EP);
F16B25/0068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/20] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schraube mit primärem und doppel-sekundärem Gewinde | [2004/26] | English: | Threaded fastener with a primary and a dual secondary threads | [2004/26] | French: | Vis avec filet primaire et filet secondaire double | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2603217 (MAGE MANFRED GEHRING) [A] 9 * the whole document *; | [A]US4040328 (MUENCHINGER HERMAN G) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]EP0494651 (RAHMEDE SCHRAUBENFABRIK GMBH & [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2325288 (EUROP IND SERVICES LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1167781 (ITW AUTOMOTIVE PROD GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * |