EP1431644 - Device for sealed connection between a pipe and a body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgat, Emmanuel 12 bis rue des vétérans 94500 Chanpigny / FR | 02 /
Dupouy, Claude 41 rue des Bois 75019 Paris / FR | [2004/26] | Application number, filing date | 03293255.0 | 19.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | FR20020016315 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: FR 0216315 | [2004/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431644 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431644 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16L19/02, F16L33/22 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F16L19/0212 (EP);
F16L33/223 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT [2005/15] |
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dichte Verbindung zwischen einem Schlauch und einem Körper | [2004/26] | English: | Device for sealed connection between a pipe and a body | [2004/26] | French: | Dispositif de raccordement étanche entre un tuyau et un corps | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 24.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 01.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2463336 (WEATHERHEAD JOHN P) [A] 1,13,14 * column 2, line 27 - column 5, line 74; figure - *; | [A]US3025086 (COLIN MOSELY ARTHUR) [A] 1,2,7,8,10,13,14 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2033643 (SCHRAUBENKOMBINAT K MARX) [A] 1,2,4,6-8,10,14 * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 22; figure 2 *; | [A]DE2817438 (COHNEN GMBH & CO) [A] 1,3 * page 5, line 29 - page 7, line 18; figure - *; | [A]US5553902 (POWERS PATRICK J [US]) [A] 1,9* column 4, line 22 - line 53; figure 1 * |