EP1431691 - Process and device for the production of a Krypton/Xenon-mixture from air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states L'air liquide - Société anonyme à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés G. Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuentes, François, L'air Liquide SA 21 avenue Maurice Berteaux 78110 Le Vésinet / FR | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Mercey, Fiona Susan, et al L'Air Liquide SA Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Mercey, Fiona Susan, et al L'Air Liquide SA, Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03300213.0 | 14.11.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | FR20020014742 | 25.11.2002 Original published format: FR 0214742 | [2004/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1431691 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1431691 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/02, C01B23/00, F25J3/04 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F25J3/028 (EP,US);
C01B13/0248 (EP,US);
C01B23/001 (EP,US);
C01B3/36 (EP,US);
F25J3/0223 (EP,US);
F25J3/0252 (EP,US);
F25J3/0261 (EP,US);
F25J3/0409 (EP,US);
F25J3/04412 (EP,US);
F25J3/04539 (EP,US);
F25J3/04969 (EP,US);
C01B2203/025 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0035 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0037 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0046 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0051 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0062 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0084 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0085 (EP,US);
F25J2200/70 (EP,US);
F25J2200/74 (EP,US);
F25J2200/78 (EP,US);
F25J2205/02 (EP,US);
F25J2215/34 (EP,US);
F25J2215/36 (EP,US);
F25J2245/50 (EP,US);
F25J2270/04 (EP,US);
F25J2290/80 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/13] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung eines Krypton/Xenon-Gemisches aus Luft | [2004/26] | English: | Process and device for the production of a Krypton/Xenon-mixture from air | [2004/26] | French: | Procédé et installation de production d'un mélange krypton/xénon à partir d'air | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/20] | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE657976 (LINDE EISMASCH AG) [X] 1-4,8,9 * page 1, line 35 - line 47 * * page 2, line 37 - line 42 * * page 2, line 58 - page 3, line 70 * * page 3, line 105 - line 116 * [Y] 5-7,10-12; | [A]US2284662 (HEINRICH KAHLE) [A] 1-12 * page 1, column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 30 * * page 2, column 2, line 59 - line 70; figure 1 *; | [A]US2545778 (JAN HARINGHUIZEN PIETER) [A] 1-12 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 27 * * column 5, line 4 - line 14; figure - *; | [A]US3037359 (HELMUT KNAPP) [A] 1,3,5,7,8,10,12* column 1, lines 9-59 - column 2, lines 57-63; figure . *; | [A]GB966725 (LEUNA WERKE VEB) [A] 1-12 * page 2, line 108 - page 3, line 88; figure . *; | [A]FR1538659 (LEUNA WERKE VEB) [A] 1-12 * page 1, paragraphs 3-5 * * page 3, paragraphs 2,3; figure . *; | [A]EP0837031 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 5,6,10,11 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US6098424 (GALLARDA JEAN [FR], et al) [Y] 5-7,10-12 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1327843 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [PX] 1-4,8,9 * the whole document * |