EP1369606 - Marking device with at least one guiding member and at least one drive slide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNIFOR 114, quai du Rhône ZI de la Tuillière 01700 Miribel / FR | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Therond, Marcel 359 Chemin du Bois 69140 Rillieux-La-Pape / FR | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Schouller, Jean-Philippe, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, Rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Schouller, Jean-Philippe, et al Cabinet Lavoix, 62 rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03356085.5 | 05.06.2003 | [2003/50] | Priority number, date | FR20020006972 | 06.06.2002 Original published format: FR 0206972 | [2003/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1369606 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16C25/04, F16C29/02, B23Q5/40, B44B3/06 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
F16C29/02 (EP,US);
B44B3/063 (EP,US);
F16C29/123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Markierungsapparat mit mindestens einer Führungsvorrichtung und mindestens einer Antriebslaufkatze | [2003/50] | English: | Marking device with at least one guiding member and at least one drive slide | [2003/50] | French: | Appareil de marquage comprenant au moins un organe de guidage et au moins un chariot d'entraînement | [2003/50] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]FR2056197 (ZENTRONIK VEB K) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2534521 (FATALUMINIUM SPA [FR]) [A] 1-3,5-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0373262 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE19808467 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19805974 (LEICA CAMERA AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2805867 (CURRENO MARIE CHRISTINE [FR]) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2056197 | EP0915260 | FR2805867 |