EP1533235 - Size-dependent automatic meat packaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monente Plösser, Francisco Pol. Ind. Can Verdalet, Naves 41-42 08490 Tordera (Barcelona) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Monente Ploesser, Francisco Pol. Ind. Can Verdalet, Naves 41-42 08490 Tordera (Barcelona) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel UDAPI & Asociados Explanada 8 28040 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel Explanada, 8 28040 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 03380268.7 | 20.11.2003 | [2005/21] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533235 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1533235 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B25/06, B65B5/12 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
B65B25/065 (EP);
B26D7/28 (EP);
B26D7/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | Grösseabhängige automatische Fleisch-Verpackungsmaschine | [2005/21] | English: | Size-dependent automatic meat packaging system | [2005/21] | French: | Dispositif automatique et dépendant de la grosseur pour l'emballage de viande | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/34] | 28.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2006 | CY | 15.03.2006 | CZ | 15.03.2006 | EE | 15.03.2006 | FI | 15.03.2006 | RO | 15.03.2006 | SI | 15.03.2006 | SK | 15.03.2006 | TR | 15.03.2006 | BG | 15.06.2006 | DK | 15.06.2006 | SE | 15.06.2006 | GR | 16.06.2006 | HU | 16.09.2006 | LU | 20.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CZ | 15.03.2006 | ||
EE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
RO | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SK | 15.03.2006 | ||
TR | 15.03.2006 | ||
BG | 15.06.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
HU | 16.09.2006 | ||
LU | 20.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CZ | 15.03.2006 | ||
EE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
RO | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SK | 15.03.2006 | ||
BG | 15.06.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
HU | 16.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CZ | 15.03.2006 | ||
EE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
RO | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SK | 15.03.2006 | ||
BG | 15.06.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
CZ | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
RO | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SK | 15.03.2006 | ||
BG | 15.06.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
RO | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SK | 15.03.2006 | ||
BG | 15.06.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
RO | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SK | 15.03.2006 | ||
BG | 15.06.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SK | 15.03.2006 | ||
BG | 15.06.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SK | 15.03.2006 | ||
BG | 15.06.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SK | 15.03.2006 | ||
BG | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
BG | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
SI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4693378 (AZEGAMI OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 30 *; | [A]WO0216210 (SEALED AIR NZ LTD [NZ], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1243386 (KRAFT FOODS HOLDINGS INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US2003167738 (WEBER GUNTHER [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |