EP1474995 - A method for producing chewing gum granules, a gum composition extruder and granulating system, and a chewing gum product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gumlink A/S Dandyvej 19 7100 Vejle / DK | [2004/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mikkelsen, Rikke Grejsdalsvej 394 7100 Vejle / DK | 02 /
Schmidt, Niels Ravn Barrit Langgade 100 7150 Barrit / DK | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Trier, Mikkel Roed, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Trier, Mikkel Roed, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2011/23] | Rotne, Jens Styrup, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2004/46] | Rotne, Jens Styrup, et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23 2630 Taastrup / DK | Application number, filing date | 03388033.7 | 06.05.2003 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1474995 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1474995 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23G4/00, A23G4/02, A23G4/04 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
A23G4/00 (EP,KR,US);
A23G3/004 (EP,KR,US);
A23G4/02 (EP,KR,US);
A23G4/04 (EP,KR,US);
B29B9/065 (EP,US);
B29B9/12 (EP,US);
B29B7/42 (EP);
B29B7/7495 (EP);
B29B7/823 (EP);
B29C48/04 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/46] | A23G3/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | Methode zu Herstellung von Kaugummigranulat, ein Kaugummiextruder mit Granuliersystem und ein Kaugummiprodukt | [2004/46] | English: | A method for producing chewing gum granules, a gum composition extruder and granulating system, and a chewing gum product | [2004/46] | French: | Procédé pour la production de granules de chewing-gum, une extrudeuse et un système pour former des granules de chewing-gum, et un produit chewing-gum | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2003 | AT | 14.11.2012 | BE | 14.11.2012 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | IT | 14.11.2012 | MC | 14.11.2012 | NL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | BG | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | ES | 25.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | IE | 06.05.2013 | LU | 06.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/20] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
IE | 06.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
IT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 14.11.2012 | |
BE | 14.11.2012 | ||
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 14.11.2012 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 14.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4161544 (KAUL DIETER [DE]) [Y] 13-15 * claims 1,10 *; | [A]US5154939 (BRODERICK KEVIN B [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9933353 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [Y] 16-20 * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 12 *; | [DXY]WO02094032 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US]) [DX] 1-12,21,22 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 18 * * page 8, line 29 - page 10, line 22; example - * [Y] 13-20; | [E]WO03053156 (PERFETTI VAN MELLE SPA [IT], et al) [E] 1-22 * page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 27 * | by applicant | WO9933353 |