EP1480350 - Determination of a channel estimate of a transmission channel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jonsson, Elias Södra Promenaden 3 211 29 Malmö / SE | 02 /
Nilsson, Johan Trulsibrunnsvägen 20 A 236 38 Höllviken / SE | 03 /
Lindoff, bengt Morkullevägen 45 237 36 Bjärred / SE | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 03388067.5 | 13.10.2003 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | DK20030000748 | 19.05.2003 Original published format: DK 200300748 | US20030472483P | 21.05.2003 Original published format: US 472483 P | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1480350 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480350 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707, H04L25/02 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
H04L25/0228 (EP);
H04B1/712 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Title | German: | Ermittlung einer Kanalschätzung eines Übertragungskanals | [2004/48] | English: | Determination of a channel estimate of a transmission channel | [2004/48] | French: | Détermination d'une estimation de canal d'un canal de transmission | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 18.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.02.2006 | BE | 15.02.2006 | CH | 15.02.2006 | CY | 15.02.2006 | CZ | 15.02.2006 | EE | 15.02.2006 | FI | 15.02.2006 | IT | 15.02.2006 | LI | 15.02.2006 | NL | 15.02.2006 | RO | 15.02.2006 | SI | 15.02.2006 | SK | 15.02.2006 | TR | 15.02.2006 | BG | 15.05.2006 | DK | 15.05.2006 | SE | 15.05.2006 | GR | 16.05.2006 | ES | 26.05.2006 | PT | 17.07.2006 | HU | 16.08.2006 | IE | 13.10.2006 | LU | 13.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2006 | ||
EE | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
RO | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SK | 15.02.2006 | ||
TR | 15.02.2006 | ||
BG | 15.05.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
HU | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 13.10.2006 | ||
LU | 13.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2006 | ||
EE | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
RO | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SK | 15.02.2006 | ||
BG | 15.05.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
HU | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 13.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2006 | ||
EE | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
RO | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SK | 15.02.2006 | ||
BG | 15.05.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
IE | 13.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
RO | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SK | 15.02.2006 | ||
BG | 15.05.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
GR | 16.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
IE | 13.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
RO | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SK | 15.02.2006 | ||
BG | 15.05.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
IE | 13.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
RO | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SK | 15.02.2006 | ||
BG | 15.05.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
IT | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SK | 15.02.2006 | ||
BG | 15.05.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
BE | 15.02.2006 | ||
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SK | 15.02.2006 | ||
BG | 15.05.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
ES | 26.05.2006 | ||
PT | 17.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SK | 15.02.2006 | ||
BG | 15.05.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
BG | 15.05.2006 | ||
DK | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
BG | 15.05.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
NL | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SE | 15.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.02.2006 | |
CH | 15.02.2006 | ||
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 15.02.2006 | |
FI | 15.02.2006 | ||
LI | 15.02.2006 | ||
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 15.02.2006 | |
SI | 15.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1191755 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [A] 1,2,12,14,23 * page 4, paragraph 25 * * claims 1,2 * * figures 3A,3B *; | [A] - USUDA M ET AL, "OPTIMIZING THE NUMBER OF DEDICATED PILOT SYMBOLS FOR FORWARD LINK IN W-CDMA SYSTEMS", VTC 2000-SPRING. 2000 IEEE 51ST. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. TOKYO, JAPAN, MAY 15-18, 2000, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20000515), VOL. 3 OF 3. CONF. 51, ISBN 0-7803-5719-1, pages 2118 - 2122, XP000968378 [A] 1,2,10-14,23 * page 2118, paragraph I * * page 2118, paragraph II * * page 2119, paragraph III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2000.851646 |