EP1358795 - Spinning reel handle assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Shimano Inc. 77 Oimatsu-cho 3-cho, Sakai-shi Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajima, Hideki, c/o Shimano Inc. 77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 02 /
Sugawara, Ken'ichi, c/o Shimano Inc. 77, Oimatsu-cho 3-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Murnane, Graham John Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Murnane, Graham John Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2005/40] | Murnane, Graham John Murgitroyd & Company, Scotland House, 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2003/45] | Purdy, Hugh Barry, et al Murgitroyd & Company, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03394041.2 | 25.04.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | JP20020130062 | 01.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002130062 | JP20020308463 | 23.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002308463 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358795 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1358795 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K89/01, A01K89/00 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
A01K89/01 (EP,KR,US);
A01K89/006 (EP);
Y10T74/20744 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/45] | Title | German: | Griffanordnung für Angelwinde | [2003/45] | English: | Spinning reel handle assembly | [2003/45] | French: | Ensemble poignée pour moulinet de pêche | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 17.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2006 | BE | 26.07.2006 | CH | 26.07.2006 | CY | 26.07.2006 | CZ | 26.07.2006 | EE | 26.07.2006 | FI | 26.07.2006 | FR | 26.07.2006 | LI | 26.07.2006 | NL | 26.07.2006 | RO | 26.07.2006 | SI | 26.07.2006 | SK | 26.07.2006 | TR | 26.07.2006 | BG | 26.10.2006 | DK | 26.10.2006 | SE | 26.10.2006 | GR | 27.10.2006 | ES | 06.11.2006 | PT | 26.12.2006 | HU | 27.01.2007 | IE | 25.04.2007 | LU | 25.04.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CY | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
FR | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
LU | 25.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/01] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
FR | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 26.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2393530 (ABU AB [SE]) [A] 1* page 9, line 1 - line 30; figures 9-11 *; | [A]US4369930 (NODA HIDEO [JP]) [A] 1,2,14 * the whole document * |