EP1342624 - Vehicle bumper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.05.2007 [2007/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcan Technology & Management Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2003/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Simon Alter Postweg 4 78250 Tengen / DE | [2003/37] | Application number, filing date | 03405063.3 | 06.02.2003 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | DE2002203374U | 04.03.2002 Original published format: DE 20203374 U | DE2002216489U | 24.10.2002 Original published format: DE 20216489 U | [2003/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1342624 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1342624 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/18, B60J5/04 | [2003/37] | CPC: |
B60R19/18 (EP,US);
B60R2019/182 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2006/24] |
Former [2003/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stossstange für ein Fahrzeug | [2003/37] | English: | Vehicle bumper | [2003/37] | French: | Pare-chocs pour véhicule | [2003/37] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 16.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11170935 ; | [X]EP0467829 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [X]DE4306824 (NORSK HYDRO AS [NO]) [X] 1,4,6,9,11 * abstract * * column 3, lines 54-56 * * figure 9 *; | [X]US5997058 (PEDERSEN ROALD [NO]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 4, lines 3-7 ** figures 4-6 *; | [X]US6343820 (PEDERSEN ROALD [NO]) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 4, lines 50-54 * * figure 10 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11170935 A 19990629 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * |