EP1471396 - Date indicating mechanism for timepiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Crettex, Frédéric Boulevard des Philosophes n 16 1205 Genève / CH | [2004/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Bovard SA Neuchâtel Rue des Noyers 11 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | GLN Rue du Puits-Godet 8a 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2004/44] | Gresset, Jean GLN Gresset & Laesser Neuchâtel Puits-Godet 8A 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 03405292.8 | 25.04.2003 | [2004/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471396 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/24 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
G04B19/25 (EP,KR,US);
G04B19/241 (EP,KR,US);
G04B19/25353 (EP,KR,US);
G04B19/2538 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/29] |
Former [2004/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Datumanzeigemechanismus für eine Uhr | [2004/44] | English: | Date indicating mechanism for timepiece | [2004/44] | French: | Mécanisme indicateur de quantième pour mouvement de montre | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/06] | 26.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.06.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR793442 (MENDL ALOIS;ZALAN FERDINAND) [X] 4 * claim 7 * * figure 2 * [A] 6; | [XA]US3811266 (SAMURA H) [X] 1,2,8 * column 6, line 3 - line 25 * * figure 6 * [A] 5; | [X]US3842590 (KATO T) [X] 1,2,8 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2371882 (HOPTROFF RICHARD GEORGE [NL], et al) [A] 6 * page 2, paragraph 6 - page 3, paragraph 1 ** figures 1-3 *; | [E]EP1351105 (NARDIN ULYSSE SA [CH]) [E] 1 * claim 1 * |