EP1479426 - Filter device and method for indicating the condition of the filter element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Levitronix LLC 85 First Avenue Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoeb, Reto, Dr. am Rain 6 8964 Rudolfsetten / CH | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [2004/48] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067, Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 03405353.8 | 21.05.2003 | [2004/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1479426 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/143 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
B01D46/0086 (EP);
B01D29/606 (EP);
B01D35/143 (EP);
B01D46/446 (EP);
B01D61/12 (EP);
B01D61/22 (EP);
B01D65/102 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/33] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Filtervorrichtung, sowie ein Verfahren zur Beurteilung des Zustandes einer Filtervorrichtung | [2004/48] | English: | Filter device and method for indicating the condition of the filter element | [2004/48] | French: | Filtre et procédé pour l'indication de la condition d'un filtre | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 20.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.07.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.07.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3794168 (PERKINS G) [X] 1-4,6,9,13-17,19 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - line 30 *; | [X]US4139466 (ROSAEN NILS O) [X] 1,2,4,13 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 19; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4332679 (HENGST BERND, et al) [X] 1,2,13* column 2, line 40 - line 55; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4654140 (CHEN YEN-MING [US]) [X] 1-5,13-15 * column 4, line 1 - line 40; figures 1-10 *; | [X]WO8803047 (MP FILTRI SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,13,14 * page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 22; figures 1-3 *; | [X]GB2311860 (ABSOLON ERIC WILLIAM [GB]) [X] 1-4,12-15,18,22 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 25; figure 1 *; | [X]WO0152185 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,13,23 * page 6, line 4 - line 7; figure 3 * |