EP1524224 - Cutting machine for blanks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/16] | Cutting machine | ||
[2005/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOBST S.A. Case Postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [2005/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gombau, Georges ch. du Raidillon 40 1066 Epalinges / CH | 02 /
Rohrer, Richard ch. de Montaux 17 1027 Lonay / CH | [2005/16] | Representative(s) | Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge, et al BOBST S.A. Case postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/08] | Poirier, Jean-Michel Serge, et al BOBST S.A. Case postale 1001 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2005/16] | Savoye, Jean-Paul, et al Moinas & Savoye S.A., 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 03405731.5 | 13.10.2003 | [2005/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1524224 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1524224 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65H33/04, B65H33/02, B26D7/18, B26F1/40 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
B26D1/00 (EP);
B65H33/02 (EP);
B65H33/04 (EP);
B65H2301/4263 (EP);
B65H2701/176 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/16] | Title | German: | Schneidvorrichtung für blattförmige Rohlinge | [2005/50] | English: | Cutting machine for blanks | [2005/50] | French: | Machine pour le découpage de poses | [2005/16] |
Former [2005/16] | Schneidvorrichtung | ||
Former [2005/16] | Cutting machine | Examination procedure | 17.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 09.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2006 | CY | 07.06.2006 | CZ | 07.06.2006 | EE | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | IE | 07.06.2006 | NL | 07.06.2006 | RO | 07.06.2006 | SI | 07.06.2006 | SK | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | BG | 07.09.2006 | DK | 07.09.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | LU | 13.10.2006 | BE | 31.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | HU | 08.12.2006 | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/03] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CY | 07.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
LU | 13.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
HU | 08.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
TR | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
LU | 13.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
HU | 08.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
HU | 08.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
BG | 07.09.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
EE | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
RO | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IE | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CZ | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SK | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9006838 (BOBST SA [CH]) [AD] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9856704 (WINKLER & DUENNEBIER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1* page 5 - page 6; figure - * |