EP1533394 - Car body component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcan Technology & Management Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2005/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bassi, Corrado Muzot Strasse 3968 Veyras / CH | 02 /
Timm, Juergen Schorenstrasse 4 78256 Steisslingen / DE | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03405826.3 | 20.11.2003 | [2005/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1533394 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/05 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
C22C21/02 (EP,US);
C22F1/05 (EP,KR,US);
B62D25/105 (US);
B62D25/08 (US);
B62D25/082 (US);
B62D25/085 (US);
B62D25/10 (US);
B62D25/12 (US);
C22C21/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | Automobilkarosseriebauteil | [2005/21] | English: | Car body component | [2005/21] | French: | Composant de carrosserie pour voiture | [2005/21] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 03.05.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4082578 (EVANCHO JOSEPH W, et al); | [A]US4525326 (SCHWELLINGER PIUS [DE], et al); | [A]EP0811700 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH]); | [Y]WO0052216 (ALUSUISSE LONZA SERVICES AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-22 * page 3; claim 1 *; | [Y] - R.DEVELAY, "TRAITEMENTS DE MIS EN SOLUTION, TREMPE, MATURATION, REVENU, OU TRAITEMENT DE DURCISSEMENT STRUCTURAL", TECHNIQUES DE L'INGÉNIEUR, PARIS, (1993), pages 1 - 20, XP008032501 [Y] 1-22 * page 2 - page 4; figure 19 * |