EP1344639 - Web embossing unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products GmbH Postfach 31 04 20 68264 Mannheim / DE | [2003/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bredahl, Gunnar Alzeyer Str.236 67549 Worms / DE | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/38] | Egeröd, Lisbeth, et al Ström & Gulliksson IP AB Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03445032.0 | 05.03.2003 | [2003/38] | Priority number, date | SE20020000757 | 12.03.2002 Original published format: SE 0200757 | US20020363093P | 12.03.2002 Original published format: US 363093 P | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1344639 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1344639 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B31F1/07 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
B31F1/07 (EP);
B31F2201/0702 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/03] |
Former [2003/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Prägen einer Bahn | [2003/38] | English: | Web embossing unit | [2003/38] | French: | Dispositif pour gaufrer une bande | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/39] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.12.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2523639 (HEINRICH HERMANN FA); | [A]EP0244348 (GRONEMEYER KG KARL [DE]); | [A]US5109767 (NYFELER ALEX [CH], et al); | [X]EP0652175 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 7, column 11, line 31 - column 12, line 51 * * page 15, column 27, line 54 - column 28, line 41; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2001047582 (GALLAGHER TERENCE J [US]) |