EP1347189 - Bearing seat with axial grooves and ridges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF S-415 50 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindén, Hans Gustafsbergsvägen 12 442 94 Ytterby / SE | 02 /
Östling, Folke Margretelundsgatan 31 412 67 Göteborg / SE | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Westman, Per Börje Ingemar SKF Group Headquarters Innovation & Patents 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Westman, Per Börje Ingemar SKF Group Headquarters Innovation & Patents 415 50 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 03445036.1 | 18.03.2003 | [2003/39] | Priority number, date | SE20020000884 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: SE 0200884 | [2003/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1347189 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1347189 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16C35/067, F16C35/073 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
F16C35/073 (EP,US);
F16C35/067 (EP,US);
F16C19/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2003/39] | F16C35/063, F16C35/067, F16C35/073, F16C35/077 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Lagersitz mit axialen Rillen und Rippen | [2003/39] | English: | Bearing seat with axial grooves and ridges | [2003/39] | French: | Logement de palier avec rainures et nervures axiales | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2581958 (KINGSTON FREDERICK S) [X] 1,4,6,8 * column 3, line 63 - column 5, line 28; figures 1-9 * [Y] 2,3,5; | [Y]GB833591 (SKF SVENSKA KULLAGERFAB AB) [Y] 2* page 1, line 65 - line 77 *; | [X]FR1372802 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK) [X] 1,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US3897988 (DICKINSON THORN W, et al) [Y] 2,3,5 * column 2, line 4 - line 18 *; | [Y]US4094559 (SLUSARSKI RONALD S) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2012010 (KUHBIER GMBH & CO) [X] 1,4,7 * the whole document *; | [X]US4228210 (SCRIBNER JACK B) [X] 1,4,6 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0287296 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP], et al) [X] 1,6-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0875686 (SKF ENG & RES CENTRE BV [NL]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0926365 (MINI GEARS SPA [IT]) [X] 1,4 * the whole document * |